CA AB1318 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1000.7 of the Penal Code, relating to diversion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deferred entry of judgment pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1318 Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1318 Stone By Cortese (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - AB 1318 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 13.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7.).
2021-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-06-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-06-21SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2021-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-12SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 962.)
2021-04-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 6).
2021-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1000.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback