CA AB1316 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5027 and 5029 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 14500, 14502.1, 17604, 17605, 37670, 41020.5, 44258.9, 47604.32, 47605, 47605.6, 47612, 47612.5, 47613, 47634.2, 51745, 51745.6, 51747, 51747.3, 51747.5, and 51748 of, to add Sections 33309.5, 37670.1, 41020.4, 41020.6, 41020.7, 46101, 47604.2, 47604.35, 47605.8, 47605.10, 47609, 47613.3, and 51747.6 to, to amend and repeal Sections 51749.5 and 51749.6 of, and to add and repeal Section 46306 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 20110 of the Public Contract Code, relating to school accountability.
Title
School accountability: financial and performance audits: charter schools: contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member . |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |