CA AB1311 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 506, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 506, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14514.4.1, 14525.5.1, 14538, 14570, 14571, and 14571.5 of, and to add Sections 14503.5.1 and 14572.1 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Recycling: beverage containers.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1311 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1311 Wood et al. By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1311 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1311 Wood et al. By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1311 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 506, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3084.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2583.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1689.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14503.5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 14514.4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14525.5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14538 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14570 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14571 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14571.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14572.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |