CA AB1309 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21220 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Employment without reinstatement: failure to enroll or report: fee.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1309 Cooley By Leyva (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1309 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1309 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2328.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 1475.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 21220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |