CA AB1307 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 734, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 734, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7145.5 of the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 6070.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 1088.5 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to taxation.
Title
State Board of Equalization: administration: collections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1307 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1307 Skinner By DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1307 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1307 Skinner By DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1307 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 734, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled measure version corrected. | |
2011-09-09 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 3188.). | |
2011-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3106.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (September 8). | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2394.). | |
2011-09-01 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-06 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-07-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29). | |
2011-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-05-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 1519.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11). | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7145.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15624 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15624.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 6070.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 1088.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6070.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 6070.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |