CA AB1306 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 127875 of, and to add Section 127876 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health professions.
Title
Health Professions Careers Opportunity Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1306 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1306 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1428.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127875 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127876 | New Code | See Bill Text |