CA AB1306 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 85300.5 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: misuse of funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-10AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code85300.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback