CA AB1305 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26002 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Medicinal and Adult-Use Cannabis Regulation and Safety Act: exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1305 Lackey Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1305 Lackey By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1305 Lackey Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2021.
2021-08-31 Approved by the Governor.
2021-08-24 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-08-23AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-07-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-12SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-06-24SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-06-24SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1154.)
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26002Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback