CA AB1304 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17140.2 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to add Division 27 (commencing with Section 27000) to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Public social services: CalKIDS: personal income taxes: exclusion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69996 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17140.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 27000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1304 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1304 |