CA AB1303 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26708 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: window tinting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1303 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1303 McCarty By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1303 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-01 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-30AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-08-24AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2756.).
2017-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2177.).
2017-07-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-06-08SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-06-08SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2017-06-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 6).
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1128.)
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code26708Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code26708.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback