CA AB1301 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 827, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 16122 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child welfare services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child welfare: adoption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1301 Cooley Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1301 Cooley By Hurtado (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1301 Cooley Assembly Third Reading By REYES (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 827, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3283.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2678.).
2019-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-04SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 2071.)
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16122New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback