CA AB1301 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 9147.10 of the Government Code, relating to the Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Legislative Committee on Climate Change Policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2017-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2017-03-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code9147.10Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback