CA AB1299 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13510.6 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: employment.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1299 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1299 Salas et al. By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1299 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1299 Salas et al. By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1299 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5471.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5466.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hurtado. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 2783.) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2745.) |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1771.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13510.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |