CA AB1298 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3303.5 to the Government Code, relating to public safety officers.
Title
Public safety officers: procedural rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1298 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 6. Page 1949.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 10). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 18). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3303.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3303.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |