CA AB1295 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23363.1, 23771, and 23772 of, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 23500) to Chapter 3 of Division 9 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Craft distillers: licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1295 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1295 Levine By Hall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1295 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1295 Levine By Hall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1295 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3133.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (September 11). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3156.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3165.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2622.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17). |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 14). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1443.) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19596.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23363.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23500 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23771 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23772 | Amended Code | Citation Text |