CA AB1295 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4656 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers’ compensation: aggregate disability payments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code4656Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback