CA AB1290 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 487e, 487f, and 491 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: theft: animals.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1290 Lee Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB1290 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1290 Lee By Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1290 Lee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB1290 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1290 Lee By Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1290 Lee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5368.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4904.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1252.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 487 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 491 | Amended Code | Citation Text |