CA AB1290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 116761.51 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 13481.6 to the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water projects: financial assistance and construction financing: Pure Water San Diego Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1290 Gloria et al. By Atkins (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1290 Gloria et al. By Atkins (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1290 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1290 Gloria Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1290 Gloria et al. By Atkins (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1290 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1290 Gloria Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 3559.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (September 13). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3542.) |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2914.). |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2689.) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1771.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116761.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13481.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |