CA AB1288 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42652.5, 48000, and 48004 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: management: funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1288 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 1661.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 17). |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42652.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 48000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 48001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 48004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |