CA AB1286 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 10.1 (commencing with Section 2505) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to mobility devices.
Title
Shared mobility devices: agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1286 Muratsuchi Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1286 Muratsuchi By Jackson (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1286 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1286 Muratsuchi By Jackson (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1286 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5381.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 18). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 12. Page 1752.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 30). |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 23). |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2505 | New Code | See Bill Text |