CA AB1286 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18796 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income tax: voluntary contributions: California
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1286 Skinner By Jackson (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1286 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1286 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1881.). |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1451.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18796 | Amended Code | Citation Text |