CA AB1286 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12072 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: purchasing restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent #10 AB1286 Huber (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1286 HUBER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1286 HUBER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-07-01 | Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment. | |
2009-06-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2009-06-24 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1429.) | |
2009-06-22 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16). | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1626.) | |
2009-05-14 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12). | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |