CA AB1282 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4826 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 4836.5 of, and to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 4920) to Chapter 11 of Division 2 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 9201, 9210, 9212, 9221, 9231, 9241, 9244, 9269, and 9272 of, to add Sections 9212.5, 9222, 9252, 9253, 9254, and 9255 to, and to repeal Sections 9202, 9203, 9204, 9205, and 9206 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animal health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterinary medicine: blood banks for animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1282 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1282 Bloom et al. By Wilk (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1282 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-02AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1.).
2021-09-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 43. Noes 12.)
2021-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-06-17SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Coms. on AGRI., B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2021-04-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and AGRI.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4826Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4836.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code9201Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9202Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9203Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9204Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9205Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9206Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9210Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9212Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9212.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code9221Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9222New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code9231Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9241Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9244Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9252New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code9253New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code9254New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code9255New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code9269Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9272Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback