CA AB1282 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 287, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 287, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.76 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1282 GRAY Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1282 Gray By Hall Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1282 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1282 Gray By Hall Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1282 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 287, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6122.). |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5059.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.76 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 4800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |