CA AB1281 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-30 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5320.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1798.145 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Privacy: California Consumer Privacy Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1281 Chau Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1281 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1281 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-30 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5320.).
2020-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-08-19SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-08-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2020-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-06-25SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-09-10SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wieckowski.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 2).
2019-06-27SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 1357.)
2019-04-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-22AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-22AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2019-04-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 26).
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.145Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback