CA AB1279 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65913.6.5 to the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Planning and zoning: housing development: high-opportunity areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1279 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 20 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Result (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Date (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Housing and Community Development] and [Local Government] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Result (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Date (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Housing and Community Development] and [Local Government] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-04-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, EQ. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 20. Page 2123.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.6.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |