CA AB1279 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10.7 (commencing with Section 4650) to Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to music therapy.
Title
Music therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1279 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1279 Holden By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1279 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1279 Holden By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1279 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2015-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2678.). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2203.). |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1333.) |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4650 | New Code | See Bill Text |