CA AB1278 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 660) to Chapter 1 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physicians and surgeons: payments: disclosure: notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1278 Nazarian By Allen (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1278 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1278 Nazarian By Allen (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1278 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1278 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1278 Nazarian By Allen (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1278 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 7.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 4. Page 5242.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2021-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 9. Page 1281.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 660 | New Code | See Bill Text |