CA AB1278 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 517, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 517, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66027.6 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary educational institutions: public services and programs: internet website notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1278 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1278 Gabriel By Hurtado (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1278 Gabriel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1278 Gabriel By Hurtado (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1278 Gabriel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 517, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3024.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2450.). |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1771.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66027.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |