CA AB1277 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7094, 9272, 30459.2, 32472, 40212, 41172, 43523, 45868, 46623, 50156.12, 55333, and 60632 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Tax administration: Taxpayers' Rights Advocate: levy or notice to withhold: return of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1277 Brough By Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1277 BROUGH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1277 BROUGH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2148.). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1564.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30459.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32472 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 40212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 43523 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 45868 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 46623 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 50156.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 55333 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7094 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 9272 | Amended Code | Citation Text |