CA AB1276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 21508, 21607, 21621, 21627.1, and 23000 of, and to add Section 21630 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local redistricting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Assembly - AB 1276 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 3866.)
2020-01-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 15).
2020-01-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-01-09Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
2020-01-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.)
2020-01-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2020-01-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2020-01-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code21508Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code21607Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code21621Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code21627.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code21630New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code23000Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback