CA AB1274 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 44011, 44060, 44060.5, and 44091.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smog check: exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1274 O'Donnell Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1274 O'Donnell By Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1274 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3331.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2786.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 2003.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback