CA AB1274 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6212.3 to the Public Resources Code, relating to public lands.
Title
Public lands: geophysical surveys.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1274 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1274 Mark Stone By Allen (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1274 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1274 Mark Stone By Allen (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1274 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2616.). |
2015-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2144.). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 1726.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6212.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6826 | Amended Code | Citation Text |