CA AB1274 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 1.81.4 (commencing with Section 1798.98) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: customer electrical or natural gas usage data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - AB 1274 BRADFORD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1274 Bradford By Monning (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1274 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1274 Bradford By Monning (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1274 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2915.). |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2093.). |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and JUD. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1337.) |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8382 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8383 | New Code | See Bill Text |