CA AB1273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21080.12 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: levee repairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1273 GALLAGHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1273 GALLAGHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 1856.) |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |