CA AB1270 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13958.5 to the Government Code, relating to victim's compensation.
Title
Victim's compensation: procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1270 TORRICO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB1270 Torrico By Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1270 TORRICO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB1270 Torrico By Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1270 TORRICO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-10 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-02 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2897.) | |
2009-08-17 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-17 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1843.) | |
2009-07-15 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-14 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-13 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-26 | Ordered returned to third reading. | |
2009-06-25 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-09 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1470.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |