CA AB1269 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 788, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 788, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26003 of, and to amend and repeal Section 26011.8 of, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 6010.8 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to alternative energy.
Title
Alternative energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1269 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1269 Dababneh By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1269 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1269 Dababneh By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1269 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 788, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3168.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2711.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and GOV. & F. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1726.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26011.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6010.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |