CA AB1269 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2168.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to medicine.
Title
Medicine: special faculty permit.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2168.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1269&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1251-1300/ab_1269_bill_20130222_introduced.html |