CA AB1264 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56043 and 56504 of the Education Code, relating to special education pupils.
Title
Special education pupils: individualized education program: meetings: school records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1264 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1264 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1264 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1264 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1264 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-15 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3143.). |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2562.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1484.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 54444.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56043 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |