CA AB1262 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13825.2 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Gang, Crime, and Violence Prevention Partnership Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1262 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3859.)
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
2018-01-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code13825.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13825.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback