CA AB126 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 56400, 56402, 56406, 56408, and 56410 of, to add Sections 56411 and 56844.5 to, and to repeal and add Section 56415 of, the Education Code, relating to special education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special education programs: Family Empowerment Centers on Disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 126 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-04-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
2021-03-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
2020-12-18AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code56400Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56402Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56406Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56408Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56410Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56411New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code56844.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback