CA AB1259 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65962 and 66474.5 of the Government Code, relating to flood management.
Title
Sacramento-San Joaquin Valley.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1259 Olsen By Berryhill (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1259 OLSEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1259 OLSEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1887.). |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-27 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1223.) |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66474.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 85320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |