CA AB1256 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 572, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 3.94 (commencing with Section 7300.3) to Part 1.7 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transactions and use taxes: County of Humboldt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1256 Wood By McGuire (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1256 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 572, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2023-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-09-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2762.).
2023-06-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-06-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 7).
2023-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2023-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 1550.)
2023-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 1).
2023-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2023-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2023-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-23AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
2023-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2023-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code7300.3Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback