CA AB1255 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 44238.5 to the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher credentialing: ethnic studies task force.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2024-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2023-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
2023-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2023-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44238.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback