CA AB1251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1094.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure: writs of mandate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1251 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-20SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2019-08-19AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2019-08-19AssemblyWithdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1510.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1094.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback