CA AB1248 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8545.7 to the Government Code, and to amend Sections 23000, 23001, 23003, and 23004 of, and to add Sections 23000.5, 23001.5, 23003.5, 23005, and 23006 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Local redistricting: independent redistricting commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1248 Bryan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1248 Bryan et al. By Allen (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1248 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1248 Bryan et al. By Allen (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1248 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 16.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 1931.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and L. GOV. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 8545.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 23000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 23000.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 23001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 23001.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 23003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 23003.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 23004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 23005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 23006 | New Code | See Bill Text |