CA AB1247 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6358 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relation to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemption: organic input material.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Retained in suspense file. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and NAT. RES. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 14502.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6358 | Amended Code | Citation Text |