CA AB1234 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 99157 of the Education Code, relating to standardized tests.
Title
Standardized tests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1234 Patterson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1234 Patterson et al. By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1234 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1234 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1234 Patterson et al. By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1234 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1234 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2898.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2289.). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1257.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 99157 | Amended Code | Citation Text |