CA AB1232 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jul 2 @ 1:30 pm in Room 112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 12087.7, 12087.9, and 12087.10 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 39712 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to energy efficiency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable housing: weatherization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1232 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and EQ.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 1881.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 22).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12087.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12087.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12087.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code39712Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback