CA AB123 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2655 and 3301 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to paid family leave, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paid family leave: weekly benefit amount.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 123 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB123 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Limón (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 123 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2022-01-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto pending.
2021-09-28AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0.).
2021-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-07-05SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20).
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
2020-12-18AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code2655Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code3301Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback